MA S490 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2318
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to notice of payment of services. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to notice of payment of services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2318 |
2015-12-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/08/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S2318 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H918 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H957 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H958 (Similar To) 2016-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H1041 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4228
H848 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H918 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H957 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H958 (Similar To) 2016-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H1041 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4228
H848 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S490 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S490.pdf |