MA S570 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H1036

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to continue care for families enrolled in MassHealth. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to continuity of care for families enrolled in MassHealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-05SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2016-05-05SenateAccompanied by H1036
2015-07-17JointHearing scheduled for 07/22/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

H1036 (Replaces) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied S570
S585 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S592 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S593 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S567 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S490 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S2133 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - New draft substituted, see S2406
H2076 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H2083 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
S522 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback