MA H1036 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S570

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Accompanied S570
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to continuity of care for families enrolled in MassHealth. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to continuity of care for families enrolled in MassHealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-05SenateAccompanied S570
2015-07-17JointHearing scheduled for 07/22/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

S570 (Replaced by) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1058 (Similar To) 2016-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3955
S676 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2099
S585 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S620 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
H83 (Similar To) 2015-10-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S983 (Similar To) 2016-01-28 - New draft substituted, see S2107
S491 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S997 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1980
S490 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback