MA S168 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2357

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to require certain officials to be trained in cardiopulmonary resuscitation. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring certain officials to be trained in cardiopulmonary resuscitation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-23SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2357
2015-10-07JointHearing rescheduled to 10/13/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2015-10-06JointHearing scheduled for 10/13/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 222
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

S2357 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S119 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4140
S1211 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1019 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - New draft substituted, see S2053
S2053 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - Ordered to a third reading
H484 (Similar To) 2016-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback