MA S692 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2383

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the Worcester Housing Authority's "Buy American Policy". Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the Worcester Housing Authority’s “Buy American Policy”

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-05SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2383
2015-06-29JointHearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

S2383 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1616 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S2012 (Similar To) 2016-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2016
S927 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1460 (Similar To) 2015-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1958
S594 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2140
H1352 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H2770 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
S29 (Similar To) 2015-06-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2015

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback