MA H1352 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4625

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to increase the number of assistant clerk positions in the first district court of Eastern Worcester. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the position of Assistant Clerk in the First District Court of Eastern Worcester

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-22HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4625
2016-05-02SenateSenate concurred
2016-05-02HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2016, pending concurrence
2016-03-16SenateSenate concurred
2016-03-16SenateSenate concurred
2016-03-16HouseReporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2016, pending concurrence
2015-05-20JointHearing scheduled for 05/27/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H4625 (Replaced by) 2016-09-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4293 (Similar To) 2016-08-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 240 of the Acts of 2016
S2361 (Similar To) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S692 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S1616 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
H2770 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
S29 (Similar To) 2015-06-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2015

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback