MA S29 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize the city manager of the city of Worcester to appoint the chair of the Worcester redevelopment authority. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the city manager of the city of Worcester to appoint the chair of the Worcester redevelopment authority

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-22 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2015
2015-06-15SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2015-06-15HouseEnacted
2015-06-11HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2015-05-13HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2015-05-13HouseRules suspended
2015-05-13HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2015-05-04HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2015-04-30SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2015-04-30SenateRules suspended
2015-04-30SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2015-04-08SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2015-04-02JointHearing scheduled for 04/07/2015 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in A-2
2015-03-25HouseHouse concurred
2015-03-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

S2024 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S1508 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
H1352 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S692 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S1616 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
H2770 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
S2012 (Similar To) 2016-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2016
S927 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H1671 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S1460 (Similar To) 2015-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1958

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback