MA S2024 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2383
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the addresses of time-share owners. Housing.
Title
Relative to the addresses of time-share owners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2383 |
2015-12-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/15/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-10-05 | House | House concurred |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2383 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1476 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1436 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S852 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H2627 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2494 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1616 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S1476 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1436 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S852 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H2627 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2494 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1616 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2024 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2024.pdf |