MA S2012 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on January 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the off-street parking board in the city of Worcester. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the off-street parking board in the city of Worcester

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-29 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2016
2016-01-19SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2016-01-19HouseEnacted
2016-01-14HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2015-12-17HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2015-12-17HouseRules suspended
2015-12-17HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2015-12-14HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2015-12-10SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2015-12-10SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2015-11-05SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2015-10-19SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2015-09-30JointHearing scheduled for 10/08/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
2015-09-21HouseHouse concurred
2015-09-17SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

S692 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S1616 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S927 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1460 (Similar To) 2015-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1958
S594 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2140
H1352 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H2770 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
S29 (Similar To) 2015-06-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2015
S2024 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S1508 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
H1671 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback