MA S1460 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S1958

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1958
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to senior citizen property taxes. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to senior citizen property taxes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-02SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S1958
2015-04-23JointHearing scheduled for 05/05/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S1958 (Replaced by) 2015-07-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1422 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1319 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1494 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1611 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1550 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1495 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback