MA S1958 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S1460

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on July 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to senior citizen property taxes,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 1958).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to senior citizen property taxes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-02SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2015-07-02SenateNew draft of S1460
2015-07-02SenateReported from the committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S1460 (Replaces) 2015-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1958
S1860 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
S1494 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1557 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1611 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1550 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1495 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1786 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1465 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1512 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1459 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Accompanied H2587
S1466 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback