MA S1422 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2314

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to pension fund performance and accountability. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to pension fund performance and accountability

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-06SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2314
2016-01-05JointHearing scheduled for 01/12/2016 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S2314 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1381 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S98 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S338 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
S1728 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1742 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S2337 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback