MA S1742 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2386
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create accountability for legislative reports. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
An act creating accountability for legislative reports
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Donald Wong [R] | Sen. Viriato deMacedo [R] | Sen. Robert Hedlund [R] |
Sen. Donald Humason [R] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Sen. Kathleen O'Connor Ives [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2386 |
2015-11-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2015 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2386 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S338 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
S1728 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1549 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S98 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S1422 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S2337 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1599 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S338 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
S1728 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1549 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S98 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S1422 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S2337 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1599 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1742 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1742.pdf |