MA S2314 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Public service issues

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public service issues

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-09SenateDischarged to the committee on Senate Rules
2016-06-06SenateOrder reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
2016-06-06SenateAccompanied by S35, S1328, S1329, S1330, S1331, S1332, S1333, S1334, S1337, S1338, S1339, S1341, S1342, S1343, S1344, S1347, S1348, S1350, S1352, S1355, S1356, S1357, S1358, S1359, S1360, S1361, S1362, S1363, S1364, S1366, S1367, S1369, S1370, S1373, S1374, S1375, S1378, S1379, S1380, S1384, S1385, S1386, S1387, S1388, S1389, S1399, S1401, S1402, S1406, S1410, S1412, S1413, S1414, S1415, S1417, S1419, S1420, S1421, S1422, S1423, S1424, S1425, S1426, S1432 and S1433
2016-06-06SenateReported from the committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S9 (Replaces) 2016-06-13 - Report accepted, in concurrence
S35 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1328 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1329 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1330 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1331 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1332 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1333 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1334 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1337 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1338 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1339 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1341 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1342 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1343 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1344 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1347 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1348 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1350 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1352 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1355 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1356 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1357 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1358 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1359 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1360 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1361 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1362 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1363 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1364 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1366 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1367 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1369 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1370 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1373 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1374 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1375 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1378 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1379 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1380 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1384 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1385 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1386 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1387 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1388 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1389 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1399 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1401 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1402 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1406 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1410 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1412 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1413 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1414 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1415 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1417 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1419 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1420 (Replaces) 2016-12-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1421 (Replaces) 2016-12-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1422 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1423 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1424 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1425 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1426 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1432 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1433 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S2045 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3839 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2046 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2113 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S2158 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback