MA S1384 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2314
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow for payment in lieu of a disability allowance. Public Service.
Title
Allowing for payment in lieu of a disability allowance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2314 |
2015-10-26 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/27/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2015-10-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2314 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2043 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #197 [YEAS 37 to NAYS 0]
S993 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S532 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S994 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied H1705
S744 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S875 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S2043 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #197 [YEAS 37 to NAYS 0]
S993 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S532 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S994 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied H1705
S744 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S875 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1384 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1384.pdf |