MA S993 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to employee benefits reporting. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to employee benefits reporting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-13SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2015-09-11JointHearing scheduled for 09/22/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

S990 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1909 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S860 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S994 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied H1705
S1021 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1828 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S915 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback