MA S1909 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to workers compensation for veterans. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to workers compensation for veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-08-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/30/2015 from 02:30 PM-05:30 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S990 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1396 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1828 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1330 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1481 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S993 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1905 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4083
S984 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1423 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1340 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1335 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1796 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S1414 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S575 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1367 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S571 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1396 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1828 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1330 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1481 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S993 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1905 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4083
S984 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1423 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1340 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1335 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1796 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S1414 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S575 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1367 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S571 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1909 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1909.pdf |