MA S1367 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2314

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to include certain employees of public higher education institutions in Group 4 of the contributory retirement system for public employees. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the retirement rights of building trades employees at institutions of public higher education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-06SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2314
2015-09-08JointHearing scheduled for 09/15/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S2314 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2377 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2454 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2357 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2383 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2432 (Similar To) 2015-10-07 - Accompanied H2334

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback