MA S1414 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2314
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to early retirement incentive program for Employees of the Massachusetts Port Authority. Public Service.
Title
Providing for an early retirement incentive program for Employees of the Massachusetts Port Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2314 |
2015-05-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/12/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2314 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1413 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1270 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1271 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1402 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1431 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2309 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
S1376 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1359 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1426 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1331 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1378 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1334 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1371 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1413 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1270 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1271 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1402 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1431 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2309 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
S1376 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1359 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1426 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1331 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1378 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1334 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1371 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1414 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1414.pdf |