MA S1271 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to suppressors. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to Suppressors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-01-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2016 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1226 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1268 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1266 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
H3273 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
S1267 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1165 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2313
S1268 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1266 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
H3273 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
S1267 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1165 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2313
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1271 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1271.pdf |