MA S1165 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2313

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to the dispense certain cancer related drugs. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the dispensing of certain cancer related drugs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-06SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2313
2016-05-23HouseAdopted, in concurrence
2016-05-19SenateReporting date extended to Tuesday May 31, 2016, pending concurrence
2016-03-16HouseHouse concurred
2016-03-16SenateReporting date extended to Monday May 16, 2016, pending concurrence
2015-11-20JointHearing scheduled for 12/03/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 and A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S2313 (Replaced by) 2016-07-05 - Committee recommended out to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1219 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S2179 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
S1137 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2152
S1173 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback