MA S2179 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relativerelative to the dispensing of certain cancer related drugs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dispensing of certain cancer related drugs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-16HouseAdopted, in concurrence
2016-03-16HouseRules suspended
2016-03-16SenateAdopted
2016-03-16SenateRules suspended
2016-03-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Same As/Similar To

H2036 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
S1165 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2313
S1042 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S2313 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Committee recommended out to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2009 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback