MA S2313 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S1165

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-05 - Committee recommended out to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to the dispense certain cancer related drugs,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2313).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the dispensing of certain cancer related drugs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-05SenateCommittee recommended out to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2016-06-06SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2016-06-06SenateNew draft of S1165
2016-06-06SenateReported from the committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S1165 (Replaces) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2313
S1219 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S2179 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
H3699 (Similar To) 2016-06-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3700 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback