MA S1137 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2152

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2152
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to restrict the sale of tobacco products at health care institutions. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restricting the sale of tobacco products at health care institutions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-03SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2152
2015-07-14JointHearing rescheduled to 07/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-07-01JointHearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S2152 (Replaced by) 2016-04-28 - New draft substituted, see S2234
S2234 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Reprinted as amended, see S2269
S2269 (Similar To) 2016-06-15 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means with the amendment pending
S1094 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1966 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback