MA S1094 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to Parking Advancements for the Revitalization of Communities (PARC). Municipalities and Regional Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to Parking Advancements for the Revitalization of Communities (PARC)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2015-12-03JointHearing scheduled for 12/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

S1291 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see S2452
S1881 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1825 (Similar To) 2015-10-15 - Accompanied H3101
S177 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S1840 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1832 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1682 (Similar To) 2016-07-26 - New draft substituted, see S2463
S1533 (Similar To) 2015-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1959
S1515 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
H19 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3092 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback