MA S1825 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H3101

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2015-10-15 - Accompanied H3101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to clarify the definition of commercial motor vehicles. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifying the definition of commercial motor vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-15HouseAccompanied H3101
2015-07-09JointHearing scheduled for 07/15/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H3101 (Replaced by) 2015-10-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H195 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
S1214 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1205 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2148
S1896 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S235 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S775 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1158 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S82 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2382
S1716 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
H579 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback