MA S35 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2314
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the appointment of special police officers in the town of Wrentham. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the appointment of special police officers in the town of Wrentham
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2314 |
2015-05-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-03-26 | House | House concurred |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2314 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3864 (Similar To) 2016-03-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2016
H4224 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Senate concurred
S2363 (Similar To) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4572 (Similar To) 2016-09-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4603
S2005 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
S2345 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3864 (Similar To) 2016-03-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2016
H4224 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Senate concurred
S2363 (Similar To) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4572 (Similar To) 2016-09-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4603
S2005 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
S2345 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S35 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S35.pdf |