MA S2046 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S1442

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on November 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the retirement benefits of state police dispatchers,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2046).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the retirement benefits of state police dispatchers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-11-05SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2015-11-05SenateNew draft of S1442
2015-11-05SenateReported from the committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1442 (Replaces) 2015-11-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2046
H2306 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Accompanied H3492
S1269 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1390 (Similar To) 2016-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1389 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1581 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1356 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback