MA H2306 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H3492

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - Accompanied H3492
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to disability or death benefits for certain members of the state police. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to Amending Disability or Death Caused by Certain Conditions of Cancer

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-27HouseAccompanied H3492
2015-11-10JointHearing scheduled for 11/17/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H3492 (Replaced by) 2016-01-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1968 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
S1403 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S555 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1442 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2046
S346 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
S2046 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2179 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
S2313 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Committee recommended out to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback