MA S1390 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to Brockton school police. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to Brockton School Police

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-22SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2015-09-08JointHearing scheduled for 09/15/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1323 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1243 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1038 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1324 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S955 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback