MA S1357 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2314

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a commission on GPO/WEP alternatives. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission on GPO/WEP alternatives

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-06SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2314
2015-11-03JointHearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S2314 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1675 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1708 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S607 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
H513 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S79 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback