MA S79 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-19 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-19 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create a special commission on behavior modification. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Creating a special commission on behavior modification
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Joyce [D] | Rep. Tom Sannicandro [D] | Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D] | Sen. Barbara L'Italien [D] |
Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2015-07-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S50 (Similar To) 2015-04-15 - Passed to be engrossed
S29 (Similar To) 2015-06-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2015
S243 (Similar To) 2015-07-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1971
S325 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2344
S351 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4155
S2499 (Similar To) 2016-11-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 325 of the Acts of 2016
S1474 (Similar To) 2016-02-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2051 (Similar To) 2016-05-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2016
H3189 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H1978 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
S29 (Similar To) 2015-06-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2015
S243 (Similar To) 2015-07-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1971
S325 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2344
S351 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4155
S2499 (Similar To) 2016-11-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 325 of the Acts of 2016
S1474 (Similar To) 2016-02-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2051 (Similar To) 2016-05-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2016
H3189 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H1978 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S79 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S79.pdf |