MA S351 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4155

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4155
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to create a special commission on institutional long term care. Elder Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve creating a special commission on institutional long term care

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-04HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4155
2015-10-15JointHearing rescheduled to 10/19/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2015-10-14JointHearing scheduled for 10/19/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs

Same As/Similar To

H4155 (Replaced by) 2016-07-07 - Amendment adopted (as recommended by the House committee on Ways and Means), see H4460
S1708 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S607 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S79 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S243 (Similar To) 2015-07-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1971
S1671 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1714 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S203 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2247
S88 (Similar To) 2016-05-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1622 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1033 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1559 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1510 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1377 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1474 (Similar To) 2016-02-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1368 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback