MA S1714 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2386
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the commission on government accountability, economy, and efficiency. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Establishing the Commission on Government Accountability, Economy, and Efficiency
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Rush [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2386 |
2015-05-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/26/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2386 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1427 (Similar To) 2015-07-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1874 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1368 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1287 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1708 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S607 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S79 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S243 (Similar To) 2015-07-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1971
S1671 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1427 (Similar To) 2015-07-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1874 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1368 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1287 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1708 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S607 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S79 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S243 (Similar To) 2015-07-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1971
S1671 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1714 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1714.pdf |