CA SB1281 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-12 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-12 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4435.1 and 4685.8 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services.
Title
Advancing Equity and Access in the Self-Determination Program Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1281 Menjivar et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1281 Menjivar Senate Third Reading By Addis (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB1281 Menjivar et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1281 Menjivar Senate Third Reading By Addis (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB1281 Menjivar et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2024-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2024-07-02 | Assembly | July 2 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | June 26 hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2024-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4210.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3978.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | April 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3428.) (April 1). |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4435.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4685.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |