MA S2386 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on July 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to state administration and regulatory oversight matters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State administration and regulatory oversight

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-08SenateDischarged to the committee on Senate Rules
2016-07-05SenateOrder reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
2016-07-05SenateAccompanied by S1616, S1622, S1625, S1629, S1630, S1633, S1635, S1637, S1638, S1641, S1642, S1643, S1644, S1645, S1647, S1658, S1661, S1662, S1663, S1666, S1667, S1668, S1669, S1670, S1671, S1672, S1673, S1677, S1680, S1683, S1684, S1685, S1687, S1688, S1695, S1696, S1697, S1698, S1700, S1702, S1707, S1708, S1709, S1711, S1713, S1714, S1715, S1716, S1719, S1723, S1724, S1725, S1726, S1727, S1728, S1730, S1731, S1732, S1733, S1735, S1736, S1737, S1738, S1739, S1740, S1741, S1742 and S1744
2016-07-05SenateReported from the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

S1616 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1622 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1625 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1629 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1630 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1633 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1635 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1637 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1638 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1641 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1642 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1643 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1644 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1645 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1647 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1658 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1661 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1662 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1663 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1666 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1667 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1668 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1669 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1670 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1671 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1672 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1673 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1677 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1680 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1683 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1684 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1685 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1687 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1688 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1695 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1696 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1697 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1698 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1700 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1702 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1707 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1708 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1709 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1711 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1713 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1714 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1715 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1716 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1719 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1723 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1724 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1725 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1726 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1727 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1728 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1730 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1731 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1732 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1733 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1735 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1736 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1737 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1738 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1739 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1740 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1741 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1742 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1744 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
H3665 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - New draft substituted, see H3858
S1990 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - New draft substituted, see S2474
H3762 (Similar To) 2016-02-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2016
S2056 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - New draft substituted, see S2353
S2133 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - New draft substituted, see S2406

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback