MA S1645 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2386

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to strengthen impact, efficiency and accountability in the government-nonprofit partnership. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Strengthen Impact, Efficiency and Accountability in the Government-Nonprofit Partnership

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-05SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2386
2015-11-04JointHearing scheduled for 11/09/2015 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

S2386 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1486 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1671 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1642 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1071 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S1714 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback