MA S1716 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2386

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide for efficient use of leased or rented property and prevent waste in use of leased or rented facilities. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To provide for efficient use of leased or rented property and prevent waste in use of leased or rented facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-05SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2386
2015-06-19JointHearing scheduled for 06/24/2015 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in 222
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

S2386 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H365 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4144
S1516 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S902 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H2972 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H1544 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback