MA S902 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2204

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to rescind an order terminating parental rights. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rescinding an order terminating parental rights

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-04SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2204
2015-06-18JointHearing scheduled for 06/24/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S2204 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S798 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1716 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
H2972 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
S1516 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
H1544 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback