MA S1700 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2386

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to obtain public records. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to obtaining information

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-05SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2386
2015-05-19JointHearing scheduled for 05/26/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

S2386 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1520 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1744 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S2120 (Similar To) 2016-02-04 - See H3858
S2127 (Similar To) 2016-02-04 - See H3858
S1576 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1575 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback