CA AB2624 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 27 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-05 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 27 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-05 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2710 to the Penal Code, relating to prisoners.
Title
Prisoners: employment: bereavement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2624 Waldron Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2624 Waldron By Durazo (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Assembly - AB 2624 Waldron Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2624 Waldron By Durazo (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Assembly - AB 2624 Waldron Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. |
2024-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-07-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-06-18 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 16). |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 2710 | New Code | See Bill Text |