CA AB3172 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Gonzalez.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Gonzalez.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1714.02 to the Civil Code, relating to obligations.
Title
Social media platforms: injuries to children: civil penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Assembly - AB 3172 Lowenthal Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Assembly - AB 3172 Lowenthal Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Gonzalez. |
2024-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 15). |
2024-08-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2024-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 5303.) |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2024-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 16). |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1714.02 | New Code | See Bill Text |