US HB1735 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 42.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To coordinate Federal research and development efforts focused on modernizing mathematics in STEM education through mathematical and statistical modeling, including data-driven and computational thinking, problem, project, and performance-based learning and assessment, interdisciplinary exploration, and career connections, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mathematical and Statistical Modeling Education Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-16HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 42.
2023-05-16HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 118-62.
2023-03-29HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 36 - 0.
2023-03-29HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2023-03-23HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
2023-03-23HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2739 (Related) 2023-09-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback