MA S1520 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2290

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to exempt private pension income from taxation. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the exemption of private pension income from taxation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-12SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2290
2015-06-19JointHearing scheduled for 06/30/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S2290 (Replaced by) 2016-05-12 - Reported in part by S1494
S1482 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1366 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1250 (Similar To) 2016-01-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1446 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1358 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1381 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1422 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1401 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback