MA S1575 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2290

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to improve tax administration processes in the Commonwealth. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To improve tax administration processes in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-12SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2290
2016-02-01JointHearing scheduled for 02/09/2016 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S2290 (Replaced by) 2016-05-12 - Reported in part by S1494
S1591 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1532 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1437 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2537 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4032
S1557 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1550 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1496 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1501 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1524 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback