MA S2127 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3858
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - See H3858
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - See H3858
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To improve public records
Title
To improve public records
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | Senate | See H3858 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Text of S2120, printed as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H3858 (Replaced by) 2016-05-23 - Reported by H4333
S2167 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S496 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1534 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1704 (Similar To) 2015-10-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2727 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2047 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #202 [YEAS 37 - NAYS 2]
S2261 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Adopted, in concurrence
S2167 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S496 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1534 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1704 (Similar To) 2015-10-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2727 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2047 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #202 [YEAS 37 - NAYS 2]
S2261 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Adopted, in concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2127 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2127.pdf |