MA H3858 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-23 - Reported by H4333
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-23 - Reported by H4333
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To improve public records
Title
To improve public records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | House | Reported by H4333 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Committee of conference appointed (Lovely-Lewis-Humason), in concurrence |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate insisted on its amendments |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-02-11 | House | Committee of conference appointed (Kocot-Kulik-Muratore) |
2016-02-11 | House | House NON-concurred in the Senate amendment |
2016-02-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #241 [YEAS 35 - NAYS 0] |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Read third |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S2127 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2120, amended |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Read second |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 4, 2016 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2120 |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-11-18 | House | Passed to be engrossed 157 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 178) |
2015-11-18 | House | Ruling of Chair sustained 122 YEAS to 34 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 177) |
2015-11-18 | House | Laid aside on a point of order |
2015-11-18 | House | Amendment 9 pending |
2015-11-18 | House | Amendment 4 adopted, as changed 157 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 176) |
2015-11-18 | House | Amendment 1 adopted |
2015-11-18 | House | Read third |
2015-11-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-11-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-11-18 | House | New draft of H3665 |
2015-11-18 | House | Pending new draft of H3665 |
2015-11-18 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S2127 (Replaces) 2016-02-04 - See H3858
H4333 (Replaces) 2016-06-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 121 of the Acts of 2016
H65 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Reported by H3333
H66 (Similar To) 2015-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2015
H3189 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H3203 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - House insisted on its amendment
H3773 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Published as amended, see H3785
H4765 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2233
H4766 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2377
H4767 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
H3665 (Replaces) 2015-11-18 - New draft substituted, see H3858
H4333 (Replaces) 2016-06-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 121 of the Acts of 2016
H65 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Reported by H3333
H66 (Similar To) 2015-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2015
H3189 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H3203 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - House insisted on its amendment
H3773 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Published as amended, see H3785
H4765 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2233
H4766 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2377
H4767 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
H3665 (Replaces) 2015-11-18 - New draft substituted, see H3858
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3858 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3858.pdf |