MA S2047 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2061
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #202 [YEAS 37 - NAYS 2]
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #202 [YEAS 37 - NAYS 2]
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The committee on Ways and Means, to whom was referred the Senate Bill to promote quality physical education (Senate, No. 1976),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2047).
Title
To promote quality physical education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-18 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #202 [YEAS 37 - NAYS 2] |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S2061 |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Read third |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Substituted as a new draft for S1976 |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Tarr) adopted |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Amendment #6 (O'Connor Ives) adopted |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Amendment #3 (McGee) adopted |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Donnelly) rejected |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Flanagan) rejected |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, November 18, 2015 |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S1976 |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S2061 (Replaces) 2015-11-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2326 (Similar To) 2016-07-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S318 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1976
S246 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
H389 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H478 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3683
H364 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
S2326 (Similar To) 2016-07-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S318 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1976
S246 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
H389 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H478 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3683
H364 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2047 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2047.pdf |