CA AB224 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-08-17 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-08-17 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19817 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to gambling.
Title
Gaming Policy Advisory Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - AB 224 Aguiar-Curry Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - AB 224 Aguiar-Curry Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-17 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire. |
2023-08-17 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2023-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1593.) |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1477.) |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 22. Noes 0.) (March 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2023-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2023-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19817 | Amended Code | Citation Text |