AZ SB1260 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Dog racing; simulcast wagering; prohibition
Title
Dog racing; simulcast wagering; prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-04-10 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (33-24-2-0) |
2024-04-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-04-03 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-04-03 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-04-01 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-04-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-25 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (15-0-2-0-0-0) |
2024-03-21 | House | House LARA Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-21 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-16 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-2-4-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate FICO Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FICO Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Amusements And Sports - Title 5
Application For Permit
Breakage
Civil Penalties
Classification
Commercial Dog Racing Permittees
Committee
Definition
Definitions
Discontinuation
Disposition
Disposition Of Revenues And Monies
Dog Racing
Effective Date
Expansion
Funds
New Permittees
Prohibition
Racing Days
Racing Meeting Permits
Repeal
Repealing
Retroactivity
Simulcast Dog Racing
Simulcast Wagering
Simulcasts
Tax
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Violation
Welfare - Title 46
Application For Permit
Breakage
Civil Penalties
Classification
Commercial Dog Racing Permittees
Committee
Definition
Definitions
Discontinuation
Disposition
Disposition Of Revenues And Monies
Dog Racing
Effective Date
Expansion
Funds
New Permittees
Prohibition
Racing Days
Racing Meeting Permits
Repeal
Repealing
Retroactivity
Simulcast Dog Racing
Simulcast Wagering
Simulcasts
Tax
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Violation
Welfare - Title 46